LINCOLN CHRISTIANS IN MISSION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides dissemination and co-ordination of Christian education and religious activities in Lincoln and the surrounding area particularly across the Christian denominations. Assists the launch of Trustee-selected projects with launch funding or loans, and monitors their progress. Current support activity is for launch of Lincoln Street Pastors, Lincolnshire Youth Mission, and The Bank Lincoln
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 October 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 12 February 1998: Standard registration
- 10 March 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- JUST 10 LINCOLNSHIRE 2005 (Working name)
- LCIM (Working name)
- LINCOLN CHURCHES TOGETHER IN MISSION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 02/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.42k | £31.87k | £20.40k | £17.20k | £1.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.95k | £35.35k | £5.14k | £32.32k | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 October 2014 | 03 March 2016 | 214 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 October 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 21 May 2015 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 15 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 17 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 28 November 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 DECEMBER 1997. NAME CHANGED 8 FEBRUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND MISSION IN LINCOLN AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA; SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LINCOLN AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window