SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1069914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The trust exists to support the work of Southwark Cathedral by funding outreach and mission work in the parish and wider Diocese of Southwark, providing ongoing funding for the Cathedral's three choirs (boys, girls and young adults) and to meet the costs of a major programme of refurbishment of the Cathedral Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £27,729
Total expenditure: £144,780

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL MILLENNIUM TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Very Revd Dr Mark Oakley Trustee 05 March 2024
THE FRIENDS OF SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
THE SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
The Venerable Jonathan Sedgwick Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Richard Cornwell Trustee 01 June 2023
SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST CIO
Received: On time
Rev Lotwina Farodoye Trustee 01 June 2023
SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST CIO
Received: On time
PHILIP STURROCK Trustee 06 March 2013
SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST CIO
Received: On time
Jennifer Page Trustee 13 June 2011
LAUNDE ABBEY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37.29k £44.79k £42.81k £13.10k £27.73k
Total expenditure £93.35k £69.21k £97.26k £78.82k £144.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Southwark Cathedral Office
Montague Chambers
Montague Close
LONDON
SE1 9DA
Phone:
02073676726
Website:

No information available