Accounts and annual returns BRUNDISH PARISH ROOMS

Charity number: 1067664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 19 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 26 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 27 November 2023 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 05 July 2022 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 April 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required