THE PEEL INSTITUTE COMPANY

Charity Number: 1068155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Peel has been building a better Clerkenwell since 1898. Our vision is for a more Connected Community. We deliver a range of activities for children, young people and older people and support residents and social entrepreneurs to deliver activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 1998: Standard registration
  • 07 June 2019: Funds received from 1133391 THREE CORNERS TRUST
  • 03 November 2020: Funds received from 1164958 THE THRIVE FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE PEEL CENTRE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosie Allimonos Chair 04 July 2023
None on record
Patrick Radcliffe Trustee 04 July 2023
BABYZONE
Received: On time
OCTOPUS COMMUNITY NETWORK
Received: On time
Patric Wong Trustee 04 July 2023
THE OFFPLOY FOUNDATION
Received: 35 days late
Emma Hallinan Trustee 18 January 2021
None on record
Anne-Marie Clive Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
Veran Patel Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Natasha Anderson Trustee 20 March 2018
BODY POLITIC DANCE
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £506.92k £543.03k £497.61k £535.67k £511.36k
Total expenditure £611.62k £445.16k £515.21k £657.00k £716.90k
Income from government contracts £73.00k N/A £65.00k £65.00k £61.50k
Income from government grants £62.50k £150.21k £72.50k £134.00k £72.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £24.68k £26.61k N/A £22.82k £17.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £37.77k
Income - Charitable activities £247.55k £225.41k N/A £228.18k £146.20k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £234.70k £248.00k N/A £284.67k £309.85k
Income - Other £0 £43.01k N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £587.81k £437.45k N/A £648.08k £709.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds £23.80k £7.71k N/A £8.91k £7.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £26.83k N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £7.28k £7.33k N/A £29.62k £27.23k
Long-term investments £7.11m £9.21m N/A £8.70m £8.95m
Other assets £506.41k £200.14k N/A £138.99k £235.20k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £132.33k £103.25k N/A £123.31k £147.67k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Peel Institute
3 Corners Centre
Northampton Road
LONDON
EC1R 0HU
Phone:
02078376082