Friends of Saint Mary's Bruton

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help to restore, preserve, repair, maintain , improve and beautify the church of St. Mary's, Bruton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 23 March 2001: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S BRUTON (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BRUTON SOMERSET (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Stevens | Chair | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Hugh Mark Wauton | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kerrin Yvette Alexandria Wauton | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Jonathan Edward Evans | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
ALISTAIR PEARCE | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
||||||
HARRY EDWIN VALLANCE MILLS | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.36k | £753 | £1.03k | £773 | £3.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £61 | £4.76k | £2.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MARCH 2001 as amended on 04 Dec 2023 as amended on 15 Apr 2024 as amended on 15 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
The Friends is established for the purposes of the restoration, preservation, repair, maintenance,improvement and beautification of the parish church of Saint Mary in the diocese of Bath and Wells (hereinafter called the "Church") and of the monuments, fittings, fixtures, stained glass, furniture, ornaments, and chattels in the Church and Churchyard belonging to the Church.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH CHURCH OF SAINT MARY THE VIRGIN, BRUTON IN THE DIOCESE OF BATH AND WELLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leat Cottage
Quaperlake Street
BRUTON
Somerset
BA10 0HG
- Phone:
- 07811121359
- Email:
- davidjstevens2802@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window