Accounts and annual returns SAVE A VALUABLE ELEPHANT

Charity number: 1070531
Charity reporting is overdue by 223 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 223 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 223 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 04 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 17 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required