Accounts and annual returns BUSHYTAILS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1067576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 December 2024 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 December 2024 165 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window