LOUGHTON MIDDLE SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1067878
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monies received for educational visits, uniform and sponsored events for school and other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Total income: £87,017
Total expenditure: £72,705
Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Milton Keynes
Governance
Registration history:
- 30 January 1998: Standard registration
- 02 May 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.31k | £112.99k | £72.99k | £69.27k | £87.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.87k | £109.17k | £61.87k | £76.75k | £72.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 15 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 15 March 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 24 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 24 February 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 18 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 18 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 13TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT LOUGHTON MIDDLE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MILTON KEYNES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window