Governing document BRITANNIA FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1069081
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 7 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED 27TH JULY 2001, 22 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 10 JUNE 2009. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.