MILTON ABBAS EMILY FAULKNER TRUST

Charity number: 1070520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The trust offers grants to students aged 14 to 24 years to advance their education and training. Applications are accepted from those who are or were students at The Blandford School or who reside in certain parishes in and around Blandford Forum. Grants are usually made to assist with additional items of student expenditure, such as extra courses, books, equipment and travel.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £5,143
Total expenditure: £5,253

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • MAEF TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN EARLEY Chair
BLANDFORD SECONDARY SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Hugo Anthony Mieville Trustee 08 August 2022
None on record
Emma Jayne Parker Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
HILARY COX Trustee 12 August 2019
None on record
Simon Gillett Trustee 13 August 2018
None on record
Leo Hughes Trustee 13 August 2018
None on record
JOHN ROSE Trustee
None on record
CAROLINE TORY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.18k £4.10k £4.31k £4.83k £5.14k
Total expenditure £3.98k £3.06k £2.66k £4.32k £5.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 28 October 2024 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 09 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BLANCHARDS BAILEY LLP
BUNBURY HOUSE
STOUR PARK
BLANDFORD ST. MARY
BLANDFORD FORUM
DT11 9LQ
Phone:
01258 459361