PARKGATE PONY SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Proving sanctuary for unwanted or sick animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 12 May 1998: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 August 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Kyle Bamford | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLEA MAY BAMFORD | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CORINNE FRANCES BAMFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.99k | £24.62k | £18.44k | £24.70k | £42.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.64k | £37.42k | £32.52k | £28.70k | £38.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2024 | 338 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 March 2023 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2022 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN REFUGES OR RESCUE HOMES OR ANIMAL HOSPITALS OR SANCTUARIES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF UNWANTED ANIMALS AND THE TREATMENT OF SICK OR ILL TREATED ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH WIRRAL, CHESHIRE AND IN WIRRAL MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Old Wood Road
Pensby
WIRRAL
Merseyside
CH61 5YE
- Phone:
- 0151 348 4081
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window