Accounts and annual returns IDMISTON & BOURNE VALLEY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1067763
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 August 2022 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required