ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION HANWORTH BRANCH
Charity Number: 1070426
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to various nautical and charitable institutions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Total income: £1,812
Total expenditure: £584
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Brent
- Kent
Governance
Registration history:
- 07 July 1998: Standard registration
- 15 March 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.33k | £548 | £2.43k | £2.31k | £1.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.22k | £1.90k | £1.89k | £2.05k | £584 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 17 March 2020 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 19 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SUPPLEMENTAL ROYAL CHARTER AND RULES AND BYE LAWS OF THE RNA (266982)
Charitable objects
AS PER RNA (266982)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HANWORTH, GREATER LONDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window