THE CHALLENGER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust enables young people from challenging backgrounds and situations to participate in outdoor activities-based personal development programmes at a multitude of UK locations, both on-site at schools and residential. It also supports young people taking part in personal development expeditions overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 February 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Lee | Chair | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Matterson | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.78k | £102.21k | £83.00k | £63.00k | £60.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.14k | £109.34k | £83.00k | £74.00k | £66.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2023 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 27 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 JANUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROMOTION OF THE DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF A WIDE RANGE OF LIFESKILLS INCLUDING COMMUNICATION, PLANNING AND ORGANISATION, PROBLEM SOLVING AND DECISION MAKING, PREPARATION FOR THE WORKPLACE, UNDERSTANDING MANAGEMENT ISSUES, LEADERSHIP AND TEAM WORKING, INDIVIDUAL AND GROUP REVIEWING, UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF DEVELOPING WORLD, SELF-CONFIDENCE, A SENSE OF RESPONSIBILITY, ASSERTIVENESS, RESILIENCE AND SOCIAL SKILLS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Far Longdon House
Far Longdon
Tredington
SHIPSTON-ON-STOUR
Warwickshire
CV36 4PL
- Phone:
- 07768897785
- Email:
- info@challengertrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window