SUPPORTING DISABLED IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support families where a child/adult has a disability to enjoy a respite holiday together. Our funds are supplemented by a charity shop which opens on Saturdays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2020
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 28 April 1998: Standard registration
- HOLIDAYS FOR DISABLED (Working name)
- SOUTH WEST HOLIDAYS FOR DISABLED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOREEN HANNAH WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jeff Walters | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA DENBY GARDNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2016 | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.11k | £12.26k | £11.91k | £10.98k | £17.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.14k | £9.05k | £9.79k | £3.99k | £6.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 213 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 213 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 579 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 579 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 944 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 944 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 14 January 2022 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICK, INFIRM AND PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DISABILITIES, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND SUPPORT ENABLING THEM AND THEIR CARERS TO TAKE HOLIDAYS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SHEILING
HORSECOMBE GROVE
BATH
BA2 5QP
- Phone:
- 01225833406
- Email:
- Doreenw598@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window