THE YADIRAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of medical and veterinary research The advancement of education in Iran through the support of individuals and institutions Advancement of education and poverty Promotion and preservation of the Persian Artistic and Cultural heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 April 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALIREZA RASTEGAR | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Jan Matthews | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SOUSSI RASTEGAR KERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.38k | £35.61k | £707.98k | £286.40k | £53.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.61k | £37.15k | £75.81k | £241.39k | £162.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £674.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £826 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £32.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £674.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £52.88k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £52.88k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £22.92k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 14TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO BENEFIT INSTITUTIONS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW AND/OR TO PROMOTE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Boroumand & Associates Llp
Viglen House Business Centre
Alperton Lane
WEMBLEY
HA0 1HD
- Phone:
- 02089970007
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window