4TH CANVEY ISLAND SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Group provide Boating and Scouting activities including climbing, archery, camping, sailing and more to young people in Castle Point and the wider community. The Group encourages it's young members including, Squirrels, Beavers, Cubs, Scouts and Explorers to take part in training towards becoming Young Leaders and in taking approved boating qualifications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 10 February 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doreen Jill Bennett | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma O'Connor | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Kemp | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Hardy | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.51k | £34.30k | £34.93k | £31.51k | £36.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.01k | £28.85k | £37.38k | £39.18k | £41.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.43k | £9.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
CANVEY ISLAND, ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Blackthorne Road
CANVEY ISLAND
SS8 7BJ
- Phone:
- 07799803491
- Email:
- barbhardy1954@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window