Trustees 4TH CANVEY ISLAND SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 1068037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorraine Cherry Byworth Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Nicola Dorrington Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Doreen Jill Bennett Trustee 31 August 2024
None on record
Emma O'Connor Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Kemp Trustee 20 February 2017
None on record
Barbara Hardy Trustee 17 February 2014
None on record