Ysgol Y Deri Parents and Teachers Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to bring together the Parents and Friends of Ysgol y Deri School, fundraising to help the many Disabled pupils of our School, provide opportunities, therapies, specialist equipment and support to fulfil their true potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 10 December 1998: Standard registration
- THE ASHGROVE SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- YSGOL Y DERI PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER REES | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE CUMMINGS | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER BRITTEN | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Gould | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.68k | £15.33k | £26.88k | £31.46k | £42.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.53k | £19.48k | £14.14k | £34.63k | £14.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 05/02/2016 as amended on 05 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SULLY RD
PENARTH
CF64 2TP
- Phone:
- 02920352280
- Email:
- yydpfa@yyd.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window