COUNSELLING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make available a Register of Counsellors who reside within the British Isles. Maintain an online register of counsellors who are able to offer free counselling to those whom might otherwise not have access to such services. Key groups are those in receipt of means-tested benefits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 March 1998: Standard registration
- 11 February 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 11 February 2025: Funds transferred to 296645 ALZHEIMER'S SOCIETY
- COUNSELLING - CARING FOR EMOTIONAL HEALTH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £991 | £789 | £641 | £571 | £506 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31k | £1.24k | £1.26k | £1.01k | £1.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 January 2025 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 March 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 12 December 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING TRAINING IN COUNSELLING (3) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE MENTALLY OR EMOTIONALLY SICK BY THE PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING SERVICE (4) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS MAY BE CHARITABLY BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window