AKIM KOTOKU DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donated six Blood Pressure Monitoring Machines to two Hospitals in the Akim Kotoku Area of Ghana. Contributed to a rural electrification fund to a village in the Akim Kotoku Area of Ghana. Awarding Scholarship to very needy students in some Akim Kotoku Area Secondary Schools. Contributed to the purchasing of books to Oda schools. Donated used Bicycles to very needy areas in the Akim Kotoku Area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Ghana
Governance
- 07 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE BREW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
EVELYN SEREBOUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINA OWUSU-AFRIYIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COMFORT OBENG-DARKO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE OKYERE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE BAFFOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KWABENA KODUAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KWAME KWARTENG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KWADWO OSEI-TUTU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE NTI-DWAMENA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KWADWO OPPONG DAMPTEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KOFI AFRIFA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.70k | £3.60k | £3.70k | £4.00k | £4.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.13k | £3.40k | £3.50k | £3.80k | £3.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 July 2024 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH APRIL 1998.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS IN THE AKIM KOTOKU DISTRICT OF GHANA: 1)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO HOSPITALS AND HEALTH CLINICS IN THE DISTRICT. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL BUILDINGS AND LIBRARIES; AND 3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
AKIM KOTOKU, GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 Woolwich Road
Abbey Wood
London
SE2 0DU
- Phone:
- 07958584415
- Email:
- brew_george@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window