TORBAY AND SOUTH DEVON MUSIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to advance musical education by promoting and sponsoring musical events - such as concerts - in the Teignbridge, Torbay and Devon education districts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £19,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Devon
- Torbay
Governance
- 19 May 1998: Standard registration
- TORBAY AND SOUTH DEVON MUSIC CENTRE (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF DEVON YOUTH MUSIC (SOUTH) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Amey ACA | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Joyce Porch | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Marie Tanton | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Fairey | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne James | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN STEWART HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.68k | £28.32k | £41.93k | £34.70k | £38.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.11k | £26.84k | £37.67k | £49.99k | £44.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.60k | £22.64k | £32.50k | £20.00k | £19.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF MUSIC TRAINING AND MUSICAL EVENTS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY-FIVE YEARS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
DISTRICTS OF TEIGNBRIDGE TORBAY AND SOUTH HAMS IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O TORQUAY BOYS GRAMMAR SCHOOL
SHIPHAY MANOR DRIVE
TORQUAY
TQ2 7EL
- Phone:
- 07862922739
- Website:
-
tsdmc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window