1ST HARDWICK GUIDE UNIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 04 February 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Marion Snelling | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Kennard Pettit | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Poulton | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Orange | Trustee | 27 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jo Stewart | Trustee | 28 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cara Maltpress | Trustee | 24 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH MUNCEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANET HAYMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.38k | £5.42k | £3.76k | £9.71k | £11.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.90k | £4.42k | £2.10k | £9.00k | £7.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14TH DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO HELP THEM DEVELOP EMOTIONALLY, MENTALLY, PHYSICALLY AND SPIRITUALLY SOT HAT THEY CAN MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 ASHMEAD DRIVE
HARDWICK
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 7XT
- Phone:
- 01954210570
- Email:
- hardwickguides@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window