Accounts and annual returns ALAN CARR FISHING FRIENDS (DISABLED ANGLERS)

Charity Number: 1069872
Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days