ALAN CARR FISHING FRIENDS (DISABLED ANGLERS)

Charity Number: 1069872
Charity reporting is overdue by 1667 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Organising activities for disabled people, including fishing trips.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018

Total income: £2,008
Total expenditure: £588

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gateshead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • A.C.F.F. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID PHILLIPS Trustee
None on record
KENNETH ARMSTRONG Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £672 £1.77k £2.14k £4.56k £2.01k
Total expenditure £1.14k £1.35k £317 £800 £588
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 572 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 572 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 937 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 937 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1302 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1302 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1667 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1667 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Abbey Court
GATESHEAD
NE8 4AL
Phone:
07786263755
Website:

No information available