Financial history THE WHELDON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1068192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £10.33k £7.35k £7.98k £7.69k £0
Total expenditure £26.20k £27.50k £12.75k £3.96k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A