Accounts and annual returns AFRICAN SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1069884
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2009 29 July 2010 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 15 April 2010 69 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 August 2010 548 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required