Trustees SUTTON-IN-CRAVEN VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1080359

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ROBERT CHRISTOPHER HARRISON-YOUNG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Suzanne McCarter | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Anthony John Mitchell | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ELIZABETH GREEN | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Russell Gill | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Gill | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Norris | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN BLACKIE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.