STUDENTS SUPPORTING STREET KIDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise awareness among students at universities and schools of the unfulfilled potential of street children in various parts of the world. Money is raised and grants are made to various NGOs which provide education, healthcare and a safe haven for street children. We currently support NGOs in Bolivia, Cambodia, Colombia, Ecuador, Guatemala, India, South Africa, Vietnam and the Philippines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 October 2021
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Oxfordshire
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Bolivia
- Cambodia
- Colombia
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Guatemala
- India
- Philippines
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Vietnam
Governance
- 22 July 1998: Standard registration
- SSSK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GORDON RAYMOND COUCH OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Yaseen Rana | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Georgia Wilson | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALYA SAYANI | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS OWEN | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
HENNA SHAH | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frederick John George Light | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/10/2017 | 15/10/2018 | 15/10/2019 | 15/10/2020 | 15/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.68k | £23.13k | £12.38k | £6.48k | £7.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.44k | £16.66k | £16.66k | £15.28k | £11.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 260 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 260 days | |
Annual return | 15 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 626 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 626 days | |
Annual return | 15 October 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 October 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13 MAY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF 'STREET CHILDREN' AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING, 1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, 2) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 BRADLEY GARDENS
LONDON
W13 8HE
- Phone:
- 02089977055
- Email:
- sssk@sssk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window