Financial history CASTLE POINT TRIANGLE CLUB

Charity number: 1068273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/10/2020 22/10/2021 22/10/2022 22/10/2023 22/10/2024
Total gross income £981 £474 £1.99k £887 £1.18k
Total expenditure £622 £80 £1.21k £983 £1.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A