Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF RODE AND NORTON SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1070284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 07 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required