Financial history FRIENDS OF RODE AND NORTON SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1070284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.24k £36.14k £31.18k £11.33k £23.74k
Total expenditure £4.18k £9.74k £44.28k £32.12k £7.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A