GT BRIDGE COMMUNITY FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for local community from parent toddler group to elderly groups including Health advice sessions. Our main dealings are within the Great Bridge & surrounding area, but never turn anyone away.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £52,366 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sandwell
Governance
- 21 May 1998: Standard registration
- THE GREAT BRIDGE COMMUNITY FORUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEIGH WHITEHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY WHITEHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACKIE DAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOB PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAGGIE TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA PASKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MADELINE WHATMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN WHITEHOUSE (CHAIR) | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.44k | £90.67k | £87.70k | £91.55k | £58.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.69k | £63.84k | £75.50k | £113.34k | £90.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £44.75k | £28.42k | £23.09k | £46.54k | £52.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREAT BRIDGE AND SANDWELL AREA SURROUNDING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE A COMMUNITY CENTRE HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY)
Area of benefit
GREAT BRIDGE AND SANDWELL AREA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARLEY PARK LODGE
WHITEHALL ROAD
WEST BROMWICH
B70 0HF
- Phone:
- 01215324023
- Email:
- gbcf@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window