Accounts and annual returns FULL HOUSE FURNITURE AND RE-CYCLING SERVICE LTD

Charity number: 1069699
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 21 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 21 December 2016 On Time