THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY CARLISLE & BORDER BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARRANGE DANCING CLASSES WEEKLY IN WINTER MONTHS AND ALSO ARRANGES WORKSHOPS AND DANCES THROUGHOUT THE YEAR
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 29 June 1998: Standard registration
- ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY CARLISLE & BORDER BRANCH (Working name)
- RSCDS CARLISLE & BORDER BRANCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Oliver- Hartley | Chair | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marlene Jackson | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Margaret McGarry | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Allen | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE KATHARINE ATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.53k | £267 | £7.93k | £6.82k | £9.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.84k | £418 | £9.94k | £5.66k | £9.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 13 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE BRANCH SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND ENGAGEMENT OF THE PUBLIC IN TRADITIONAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING AND IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF:- 4.1 PRESERVE AND FURTHER THE PRACTICE OF TRADITIONAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING. 4.2 PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING EDUCATION OR INSTRUCTION TO SOCIETY STANDARDS IN THE PRACTICE OF SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING. 4.3 PROMOTE THE ENJOYMENT AND APPRECIATION OF SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING AND MUSIC BY ANY SUITABLE MEANS.
Area of benefit
CARLISLE, WESTERN BORDERS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Hadrian Way
Houghton
CARLISLE
CA3 0LU
- Phone:
- 01228592760
- Email:
- dunmor.21@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window