MEVAGISSEY PLAYING FIELD MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity holds 'on Trust a playing field for the use of the inhabitants of Mevagissey and the neighbourhood without distinction of sex or of political, religious or other opinion: and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 27 February 1998: Standard registration
- MEVAGISSY PLAYING FIELD MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mevagissey Activity Centre CIC | Trustee | 22 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.50k | £5.62k | £6.30k | £5.83k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.50k | £5.62k | £6.30k | £5.83k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22/08/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF A PLAYING FIELD FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF MEVAGISSEY AND THE NEIGHBORHOOD
Area of benefit
MEVAGISSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
MEVAGISSEY ACTIVITY CENTRE
VALLEY ROAD
MEVAGISSEY
ST. AUSTELL
PL26 6SA
- Phone:
- 01726844733
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window