Accounts and annual returns THE HAYES PRIMARY SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1068442

Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window