CHIPS - Children's integrated playschemes

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
INTEGRATED PLAYSCHEMES FOR CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND THEIR SIBLINGS LIVING IN EAST HERTFORDSHIRE AND THE BOROUGH OF BROXBOURNE ON SATURDAYS AND DURING SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. THE CHARITY ALSO RUNS SPECIALIST INTEREST GROUPS -COOKERY,COMPUTER AND CLIMBING ,AND A TEEN GROUP FOR THE OLDER CHILDREN .WE ALSO ORGANISE CHRISTMAS PARTIES AND A SUPPORT GROUP FOR PARENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £156,638 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 13 May 1998: Standard registration
- 11 September 2024: Funds received from 1042779 THE WESTFIELD PRE-SCHOOL
- CHIPS (Working name)
- CHILDREN'S INTEGRATED PLAYSCHEMES (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM PETER NICKSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alexander James | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Thomas | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Mary Ivison | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR SUKANTA BANERJEE | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Elaine Campbell | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MATT COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.92k | £304.17k | £309.99k | £309.96k | £349.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.09k | £237.32k | £285.28k | £327.32k | £371.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £142.75k | £159.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £164.78k | £156.20k | £156.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST APRIL 1998 as amended on 21 Oct 2020 as amended on 21 Oct 2022 as amended on 06 Jan 2025 as amended on 30 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, PARTICULARLY BY (!) OFFERING INTEGRATED PLAY AND SOCIAL OPPORTUNITIES TO CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND THEIR SIBLINGS (2) SUPPORTING THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS THROUGH RESPITE, MUTUAL SUPPORT AND INFORMATION AND INCREASING DISABILITY AWARENESS IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C H I P S
2nd Floor
Four Rivers House
4C Fentiman Walk
Hertford
Hertford
- Phone:
- 01992804952
- Email:
- info@chipsplay.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window