Financial history AMADEUS CHORUS AND ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1073594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.81k £3.52k £66.36k £44.44k £68.27k
Total expenditure £14.33k £6.50k £55.98k £56.38k £51.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A