Financial history VISION CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP, GATESHEAD

Charity number: 1069134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.78k £7.53k £6.73k £7.19k £4.00k
Total expenditure £4.11k £5.41k £7.50k £6.39k £8.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A