IMPACT SCHOOLS TEAM TRUST

Charity number: 1068653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Impact Schools Team is committed to serve the schools of Powys (mainly North Powys). Our main aim is to communicate in a relevant and varied way the Christian message and values to both primary and secondary schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £34,746
Total expenditure: £44,739

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Powys

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 March 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • IMPACT SCHOOLS TEAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lynette Lovell Chair 31 July 2024
None on record
Alun Jonathan Sims Rees Trustee 31 July 2024
None on record
Ruth Jones Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Stephanie Benbow Trustee 16 January 2019
None on record
Dave Morris Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.27k £29.96k £29.96k £32.96k £34.75k
Total expenditure £40.42k £33.38k £33.38k £28.19k £44.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 Cae'r Fferm
CAERPHILLY
Mid Glamorgan
CF83 2QB
Phone:
07503150141