HALL FOR GWINEAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Theatre evenings. Hire of Hall for Children and Evening Parties. Hire of Hall for Play Group. Hire of Hall for social activities, i.e. sewing group and band practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 25 February 2000: Standard registration
- GWINEAR VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TYRONE PAUL HOMES | Chair | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Goundry | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARION HOCH | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HOMES | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES FRANCIS HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR NEIL HARVEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.33k | £5.32k | £5.94k | £6.81k | £6.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.99k | £8.98k | £5.50k | £5.84k | £4.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 482 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 482 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 847 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 847 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1212 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1212 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 20 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY FORMERLY KNOWN AS GWINEAR CHURCH HALL AND NOW KNOWN AS GWINEAR VILLAGE HALL (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHARITY") SHALL BE MANAGED FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GWINEAR IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GWINEAR IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 CHURCHTOWN
GWINEAR
HAYLE
TR27 5JL
- Phone:
- 01736850698
- Email:
- info@hallforgwinear.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window