TRUST FOR AFRICA'S ORPHANS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the poverty of and educate orphans, needy and vulnerable children in Africa, and in Uganda in particular, who are in need, hardship or distress or who have need of assistance by reason of their youth or social and economic circumstances. Our programmes are based on implementing income-generating activities, such as sustainable farming, to enable the families to become self-supporting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Uganda
Governance
- 21 April 1998: Standard registration
- 22 September 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TRUST FOR AFRICA'S ORPHANS (Working name)
- THE UWESO UK TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 30/06/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.41k | £137.81k | £398.10k | £248.17k | £199.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.50k | £198.89k | £210.40k | £272.08k | £548.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 10 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 10 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 03 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 03 July 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 19 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 19 September 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1997 AMENDED BY ORDER OF 4 APRIL 2006 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF, AND TO EDUCATE ORPHANS AND OTHER CHILDREN IN UGANDA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM, OR WHO HAVE NEED OF ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
UGANDA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window