Accounts and annual returns KENT CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity Number: 1069391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required