SPROUGHTON MILLENNIUM GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain and promote The Sproughton Millennium Green
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 06 March 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Michael Barber | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Lister | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Patrick Scannell | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Michael Smith | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan James Tuppen | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|||||
SIMON FRASER CURL | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Emma Kate Middleditch | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Barnes | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04k | £3.08k | £3.25k | £1.77k | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.13k | £1.21k | £2.44k | £1.20k | £913 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30/01/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/03/2011
Charitable objects
[1] THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO THE PROVISION OF THE PROPERTY AND SHALL ACCORDINGLY HOLD ANY PROPERTY TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS "SPROUGHTON MILLENNIUM GREEN" FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AND AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. [2] THE FOLLOWING PROVISIONS OF THIS CLAUSE ARE A STATEMENT OF THE GENERAL AIMS OF THE CHARITY TO WHICH THE GENERAL AIMS IF THE CHARITY TO WHICH THE TRUSTEES ARE (SUBJECT TO THE FOLLOWING ) TO HAVE REGARD AT ALL TIMES BUT NO PART OF OR PROVISION IN SUCH STATEMENT IS TO QUALIFY DEROGATE FROM ADD TO OR OTHERWISE AFFECT THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN CLAUSE 3.1 AND THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS (WHICH SHALL IN THE EVENT OF AND CONFLICT PREVAIL OVER SUCH STATEMENT).
Area of benefit
SPROUGHTON SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hallfield Cottage
Sproughton
IPSWICH
IP8 3AD
- Phone:
- 01473 742862
- Email:
- jonjtuppen@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window