TIME OUT MISSION INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Time Out Mission assists better quality of life especially for poor peoples of the world. This is through training and support of agricultural and business forums. These forums encourage a greater sense of community and helping one another, as well as the means to provide education and training in low cost, effective practical farming techniques, which are accessible to even the poorest peoples.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Burundi
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 22 September 1998: Standard registration
- HARVEST FOR CHRIST NETWORKING MINISTRIES (Working name)
- THE BODY AND THE BRIDE (Working name)
- HARVEST FOR CHRIST (Previous name)
- THE BODY AND THE BRIDE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Lewis | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Daniel Pike | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PIKE | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Waters | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.39k | £6.68k | £37.20k | £17.76k | £28.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.85k | £6.74k | £36.90k | £18.16k | £29.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 390 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 279 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 August 2020 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 AUGUST 1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 4 FEBRUARY 2011.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waters Group
Quimperle Way
Liskeard Business Park
LISKEARD
Cornwall
PL14 3US
- Phone:
- 07785747247
- Email:
- admin@timeoutmission.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window