Accounts and annual returns THE NEWSPAPER EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1069862
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 03 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 15 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 27 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 27 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 06 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 10 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 20 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 20 September 2006 On Time