CORD BLOOD CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medical
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 May 1998: Standard registration
- 23 March 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228 | £228 | £228 | £328 | £328 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 08 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 08 December 2015 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 04 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 29 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF THE SICK AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND IN PARTICULAR (A) TO INCREASE THE NUMBER OF UNITS OF CYROPRESERVED CORD BLOOD UNITS HELD AT THE LONDON CORD BLOOD BANK ("THE CENTRE") AND TO SUSTAIN THE UNITS AT SUCH A LEVEL AS WILL MEET THE DEMAND FOR TRANSPLANTATION TO CHILDREN AND ADULTS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WITH ACQUIRED OR GENETIC HAEMATOLOGICAL AND/OR IMMUNOLOGICAL DISEASE (B) TO SUPPORT THE ACTIVITIES OF THE CENTRE IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND TO ENABLE SICK CHILDREN AND ADULTS FROM ALL OVER THE WORLD TO BENEFIT FROM THE FACILITIES OF THE CENTRE AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (I) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF CORD BLOOD BANKING TO PROFESSIONAL, PATIENT AND LAY PERSONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; (II) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT BLOOD TRANSPLANTATION; (III) TO SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT TO IMPROVE ALL ACTIVITIES ASSOCIATED WITH: - CORD BLOOD BANKING; - CORD BLOOD TRANSPLANTATION FOR HAEMATOLOGICAL AND IMMUNOLOGICAL DISEASE WHETHER ACQUIRED OR GENETIC; - THE APPLICATION OF GENE THERAPY USING CORD OR OTHER FOETAL HAEMATOPOIETIC PROGENITORS; (IV) TO PROMOTE CLINICAL AND SCIENTIFIC COLLABORATION BETWEEN TRANSPLANT CENTRES IN THE UK AND ABROAD AND THE CENTRE; AND (V) TO PROMOTE SCIENTIFIC AND OPERATIONAL COLLABORATION BETWEEN CORD BANKS IN THE UK AND ABROAD. 2) IN ADDITION THE PRIMARY OBJECT EXPRESSED ABOVE THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE TO SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window