Accounts and annual returns COVENTRY SCOUT GANG SHOW LTD.

Charity number: 1071594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 August 2024 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window