COVENTRY SCOUT GANG SHOW LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle objective of the charity is to promote the education and development of young poeple in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spirital potential, in particular by the production of an annual theatrical event
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
Governance
- 18 September 1998: Standard registration
- COVENTRY GANG SHOW LIMITED (Previous name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS SHERLOCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lionel Sidney Gibson | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morris | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WHITTINGTON | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE ANTHONY DOUGLAS BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.49k | £25.09k | £20.75k | £9.55k | £6.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.31k | £12.31k | £9.96k | £26.51k | £20.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 MAY 1998 as amended on 13 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE CITY OF COVENTRY IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PRODUCTION OF AN ANNUAL THEATRICAL EVENT
Area of benefit
CITY OF COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 ROSSLYN AVENUE
COVENTRY
CV6 1GL
- Phone:
- 02476693900
- Email:
- lionel.g@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window